Pereira-Hong, Natasha Lynn (CPSO#: 72167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Pereira, Natasha Lynn (used until: 27 Sep 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone: (519) 836-4830
Fax: (519) 836-1341
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natasha Pereira-Hong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Pereira-Hong ( CPSO# 72167 )
Dr. D. Hong ( CPSO# 70422 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone Number: (519) 836-4830

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASHA LYNN PEREIRA-HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREIRA-HONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003