Perl, Jeffrey (CPSO#: 79452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Nephrology
St Michaels Hospital
Room 3 060 Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6016
Fax: (416) 864-3042
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Perl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Perl ( CPSO# 79452 )

Business Address:
Division of Nephrology
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 3-060 Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY PERL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007