Perrigo, Bradley Edmund (CPSO#: 74673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 323-9800
Fax: (705) 323-9601
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bradley E. Perrigo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Perrigo ( CPSO# 74673 )

Business Address:
204 - 119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 323-9800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY EDMUND PERRIGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRIGO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002