Perrin, Mark Jonathan (CPSO#: 92357)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of New South Wales, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Jan 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2012