Persad, Vidia Lutchmi (CPSO#: 72152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 234
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 595-0552
Fax: (905) 595-0557
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vidia Persad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Persad ( CPSO# 72152 )

Business Address:
Suite 234
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 595-0552

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIDIA LUTCHMI PERSAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERSAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2002