Persaud, Jeeshan (CPSO#: 92957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wise Elephant Family Health Team
25 Gateway Blvd
Brampton ON  L6T 4X2
Phone: (289) 323-0660
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeeshan Persaud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Persaud ( CPSO# 92957 )

Business Address:
25 Gateway Boulevard
Suites 3 and 4
Brampton ON  L6T 4X2
Phone Number: (289) 323-0660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEESHAN PERSAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERSAUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012