Persaude, Darshini Devi (CPSO#: 72787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Phone: (905) 492-3376
Fax: (905) 492-3379
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1333 Sheppard Ave, East
Suite 319
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: 416-502-1000
Fax: 416-502-1030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARSHINI DEVI PERSAUDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERSAUDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000