Peters, Sarah Christina (CPSO#: 93693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anishnawbe Mushkiki
101 N. Syndicate Ave, Ste 510-A
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 3V4
Phone: 807-623-0383
Fax: 807-623-0135
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

79 5th Ave N
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1A8
Canada
Phone: 807-737-3803
Fax: 807-737-1771
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah C. Peters Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Peters ( CPSO# 93693 )

Business Address:
Anishnawbe Mushkiki
101 Syndicate Avenue North
Suite 2B
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 3V4
Phone Number: (807) 623-0383

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Business Address:
79 - 5th Avenue North
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1A8

Business Address:
20 B Coutier Road
Terrace Bay ON  P0T 2W0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Aug 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH CHRISTINA PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2013