Peterson, Carly Elizabeth (CPSO#: 90249)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Mar 2009 to 29 Mar 2009
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2014