Peterson, Daniel Ron (CPSO#: 89212)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013