Peterson, Sean Richard Daniel (CPSO#: 86555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
481 London Rd
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone: 519-337-7512
Fax: 519-337-3257
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

BWH ER
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: 519-464-4400 Ext. 5214
Fax: 519-339-7264
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Peterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Peterson ( CPSO# 86555 )

Business Address:
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 337-7512

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
Emergency
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
Nurture North
239 Main Street East
North Bay ON  P1B 1B2
Phone Number: (705) 478-7191

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN RICHARD DANIEL PETERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2009