Peticca, Patricia (CPSO#: 82498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Ottawa Diabetes & Endocrinology
208-4100 Strandherd Dr
Ottawa ON  K2J 0V2
Phone: (613) 505-9704
Fax: (613) 505-9707
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peticca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Peticca ( CPSO# 82498 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
4100 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2J 0V2
Phone Number: (613) 505-9704

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA PETICCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETICCA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 20 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 06 Dec 2010 to 06 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2012