Petrie, Matthew Douglas (CPSO#: 77861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kelowna General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2268 Pandosy Streeet
Kelowna BC  V1Y 1T2
Phone: 2509801760
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Emergency Department
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: (705) 645-4404
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Feb 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW DOUGLAS PETRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 02 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Jan 2006 to 02 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 03 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007