Petrof, Elaine Olga (CPSO#: 88179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Division of Infectious Diseases
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 533-6000 Ext. 75471
Fax: (613) 533-6863
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Petrof & Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Petrof ( CPSO# 88179 )
Dr. C. Smith ( CPSO# 88091 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 533-6000

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5N6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Sep 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Elaine Olga Petrof may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Infectious Diseases, Queen's University, in which Dr.
                        Petrof holds an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank  of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.  Petrof no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.