Petroniene, Rima (CPSO#: 71994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian, Russian

Education:Kaunas Medical Institute, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 721-3344
Fax: (705) 721-5522
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rima Petroniene Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 19 2015


Corporation Name: Dr. Rima Petroniene Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Petroniene ( CPSO# 71994 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 721-3344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RIMA PETRONIENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRONIENE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 04 Nov 2002
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2000
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008