Petrosyan, Andranik (CPSO#: 97051)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Yerevan State Medical University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2011 to 15 Feb 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 16 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013