Petroz, Guy Christian (CPSO#: 72772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jul 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Geneva, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Dept of Anesthesia & Pain Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guy Petroz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Petroz ( CPSO# 72772 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jul 2001 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2008 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Guy Christian Petroz may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Anaesthesia,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr.
                        Petroz   holds   a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or  research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required  by  the teaching or research requirement of
                        his appointment. 
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Petroz no longer holds
                  the appointment, referred to in clause 1.