Petruccelli, Karen (CPSO#: 79453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital site
CAMHS
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4421
Fax: (905) 813-1594
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Petruccelli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Petruccelli ( CPSO# 79453 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 816-4421

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN PETRUCCELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRUCCELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2010