Pfeiffer, Any Zuleika (CPSO#: 79670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Jun 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (289) 386-0811
Fax: (289) 386-1360
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pfeiffer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pfeiffer ( CPSO# 79670 )

Business Address:
101 - 450 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Phone Number: (905) 878-9720

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 23 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Nov 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2010 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.   Any   Zuleika  Pfeiffer  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  Paediatrics, only.