Pham, Huyen Thi Lan (CPSO#: 79515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: Nguyen, Huyen Thi Lan (used until: 07 Sep 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
woolwich community health centre
10 Parkside Drive P.O. Box 370
St Jacobs ON  N0B2N0
Phone: (519)664-3794
Fax: 5196642182
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Waterloo Region Public Health
Sexual Health and Harm Reduction
99 Regina St.S, second floor
Waterloo ON  N2J 4V3
Canada
Phone: (519) 883-2267
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUYEN THI LAN PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2005