Phillips, Colin Robert James (CPSO#: 96023)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 18 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2017