Phillips, Shauna Dae (CPSO#: 93100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1881 Yonge St
Suite 502
Toronto ON  M4S3C4
Phone: 4165399598
Fax: 4165390802
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shauna Dae Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Phillips ( CPSO# 93100 )

Business Address:
1881 Yonge Street
Suite 502
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone Number: (416) 539-9598

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUNA DAE PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012