Phillipson, Ronald Anthony (CPSO#: 77843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Aug 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B1
333 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3H 1T2
Phone: (647) 317-1213
Fax: (647) 317-1875
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

389 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6X 1N7
Canada
Phone: 289-752-2295
Fax: 289-752-4055
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Canadian Centre for Addictions
754 Dorset St W
Port Hope ON L1A 1G4
Port Hope ON  L1A 1G4
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Trafalgar Residence Inc. - Trafalga
5483 Trafalgar Road North
PO Box 885
Erin, Ontario N0B1T0
Erin ON  N0B 1T0
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Trafalgar East Day Campus
48 Mill St. South, Unit 2
Port Hope, Ontario L1A 2S5
Port Hope ON  L1A 2S5
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Trafalgar East Residence
5316 Rice Lake Scenic Dr
PO Box 180
Gores Landing K0K 2E0
Gores Landing ON  K0K 2E0
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Comprehensive Treatment Clinic
1154 Danforth
Toronto ON M4J 1M3
Toronto ON  M4J 1M3
Canada
Phone: 647-490-4008
Fax: 647-689-5890
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald Phillipson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Phillipson ( CPSO# 77843 )

Business Address:
Suite B1
333 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 1T1
Phone Number: (647) 317-1213

Business Address:
398 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6X 1N7
Phone Number: (289) 752-2295

Business Address:
3 Warrendale Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1P9

Business Address:
754 Dorset Avenue West
Port Hope ON  L1A 1G4

Business Address:
3 Trafalgar Road North
PO Box 885
Erieau ON  N0B 1T0


Corporation Name: R. Phillipson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Phillipson ( CPSO# 77843 )

Business Address:
6-389 Main Street
Brampton ON  L6X 1N7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 30, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ronald Anthony
            Phillipson in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Phillipson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                     DR. RONALD ANTHONY PHILLIPSON
                                          ("Dr. Phillipson")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Phillipson, certificate of registration number 77843, am a member
                  of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Phillipson, acknowledge that the College conducted an
                  investigation bearing File Number 7215497 (the "Investigation") into
                  whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my
                  practice at the Canadian Centre for Addictions ("CCA").

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Phillipson, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Phillipson, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months
                        after the date of this Undertaking, I will submit to a reassessment
                        of my practice at the CCA ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with CCA directors and
                        staff, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary
                        by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Phillipson, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Phillipson, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Phillipson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to carry out the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Phillipson, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and
                        NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and Appendix
                        "B", respectively. 
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Phillipson, undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location at which I practise or have privileges, including,
                        but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics and offices, in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice
                        Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.
                        Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and
                        all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                        practice at that location.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Phillipson, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Phillipson, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Phillipson, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Phillipson, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to the owners and/or operators of CCA and any Chief of Staff,
                  or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Phillipson, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Phillipson, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Phillipson, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Phillipson, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Phillipson engaged in professional misconduct in the practice
                              of medicine. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Phillipson's practice at the Canadian Centre for
                              Addictions will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the
                              College within, approximately, 12 months.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Phillipson, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT 

            (14)  I, Dr. Phillipson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating the Reassessment and to all Assessors: 

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking. 
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Phillipson, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate the Reassessment and to all Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of the
                        Reassessment and which they reasonably believe indicates a
                        potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 30, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ronald Anthony Phillipson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 30, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Phillipson engaged in professional misconduct in the practice of medicine. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Phillipson’s practice at the Canadian Centre for Addictions will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within, approximately, 12 months.