Piche, Janelle Renee Marie (CPSO#: 94399)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Piche Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Brampton Civic Hospital, 2100 Bovaird Drive East, Brampton, ON L6R 3J7
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 25 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015