Pierce, Jennifer Louise (CPSO#: 86418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth & Smiths Falls
District Hospital
60 Cornelia St. W
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Fax: 613-283-8990
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Arnprior and District Memorial
Hospital
350 John St W
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 623-3166
Fax: 613-623-2430
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Pierce Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pierce ( CPSO# 86418 )

Business Address:
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Business Address:
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital
350 John Street West
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LOUISE PIERCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIERCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009