Pierre, Sephora Anne-Marie (CPSO#: 85295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French, Spanish

Education:Inst Super De Ciencias Med Villa Clara, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
109-705 cotton Mills
Cornwall ON  K6H 7K7
Phone: 6139329494
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sephora Anne-Marie Pierre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pierre ( CPSO# 85295 )

Business Address:
109 - 705 Cotton Mills
Cornwall ON  K6H 7K7
Phone Number: (613) 932-9494

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 21 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEPHORA ANNE-MARIE PIERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIERRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2014