Piersanti, Monique (CPSO#: 72336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 828-6522
Fax: (905) 828-6967
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Piersanti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Piersanti ( CPSO# 72336 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (416) 624-6522

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 30 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIQUE PIERSANTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIERSANTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2002