Piggott, Thomas William (CPSO#: 103365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
David Braley Health Sciences Centre
2006-100 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 925-9140
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1960 Appleby Line #18
Burlington ON  L7L0B7
Canada
Phone: (905) 319-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

238 Grand River St N
Paris ON  N3L 2M2
Canada
Phone: (519) 442-2251
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS WILLIAM PIGGOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIGGOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017