Piliotis, Eugenia (CPSO#: 71122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
Department of Hematology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4662
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Piliotis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Piliotis ( CPSO# 71122 )

Business Address:
Odette Cancer Centre
Department of Hematology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 2S5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENIA PILIOTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILIOTIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2001