Pilkey, Bradley Dean (CPSO#: 78180)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 May 2005