Pillai, Geetha (CPSO#: 80357)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 840-1965
Fax: (519) 840-1963
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Geetha Pillai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Pillai ( CPSO# 80357 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 840-1965

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Feb 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEETHA PILLAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILLAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 31 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008