Pillon, Sylvia Marta (CPSO#: 93309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
Rm E1-102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St.
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: 519-646-6100
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.M. Pillon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pillon ( CPSO# 93309 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room E1-102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 16 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVIA MARTA PILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012