Pinard, Brigitte (CPSO#: 90277)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2013