Pinilla Echeverri, Natalia (CPSO#: 105404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Caldas, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
Room Number 3A1C.108
Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 9053784647 Ext. 46761
Fax: 2893981017
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalia Pinilla Echeverri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Pinilla Echeverri ( CPSO# 105404)

Business Address:
McMaster University
Division of Cardiology
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Colombia
Spain

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Apr 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 12 Mar 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 13 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jan 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Natalia Pinilla Echeverri may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Cardiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. Pinilla
                        Echeverri holds  an  academic  appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of issuance or when Dr. Pinilla Echeverri no longer holds  the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives   a   report  indicating  that  Dr.  Pinilla
                        Echeverri's  clinical  performance,   knowledge,  skill,  judgment,
                        professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee  makes  a decision about Dr. Pinilla Echeverri's
                        certificate  of  registration,   following   consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued on April 1, 2018, and expires  on  June  30,
                  2021.  Upon renwal of  Dr.  Pinilla  Echeverri's  academic appointment at
                  McMaster  University,  the expiry date can be extended,  subject  to  the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.