Pinkoski, Craig (CPSO#: 87129)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jul 2009 to 17 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jul 2010 to 17 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018