Pinto, Crystal Mary-Lou (CPSO#: 93168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Outpatient Mental Health
5 Morrow/5 Glendale Wing
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6591
Fax: (416) 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E. 2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: (416) 591-4410
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Crystal Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pinto ( CPSO# 93168 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Outpatient Mental Health
5 Morrow/5 Glendale Wing
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6591

Business Address:
Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide Street East
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Phone Number: (416) 591-4410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRYSTAL MARY-LOU PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015