Pinto, Natasha (CPSO#: 91459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huronia Medical Centre
Suite 103
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-8482
Fax: (705) 526-8789
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natasha Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Pinto ( CPSO# 91459 )

Business Address:
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
Suite 103
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-8482

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASHA PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011