Pinto, Victoria Josephine Maria (CPSO#: 83588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
631 Queeston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 6R5
Phone: (905) 560-4600
Fax: (905) 560-2644
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria J. Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Pinto ( CPSO# 83588 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
631 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 6R5
Phone Number: (905) 560-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA JOSEPHINE MARIA PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 13 Oct 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 14 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2010