Piran, Sanaz (CPSO#: 81131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Medical Diagnostics Unit
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 847-9779
Fax: (905) 847-7667
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

11 Bronte Rd, Unit 33
Oakville ON  L6L 3B6
Canada
Phone: (905) 847-9779
Fax: (905) 847-7667
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanaz Piran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Piran ( CPSO# 81131 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Cardiology MDU
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 847-9779

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
33 - 11 Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6L 3B6
Phone Number: (905) 847-9779

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANAZ PIRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008