Piran, Siavash (CPSO#: 95870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: 416-259-4196
Fax: 416-521-4076
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIAVASH PIRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 05 Feb 2019
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2015