Pitcher, Jeff (CPSO#: 91515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3498 Shadow Creek Road
Severn ON  L3V 0V8
Phone: (705) 514-0165
Fax: (705) 514-0770
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

75 Ann St
Bracebridge ON  P1L2E4
Canada
Phone: 7056454404
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pitcher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pitcher ( CPSO# 91515 )

Business Address:
3498 Shadow Creek Road
Severn ON  L3V 6H3
Phone Number: (705) 242-8085

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFF PITCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2012