Pitre, Theresa Joan (CPSO#: 74709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Downs Family Practice
425 University Avenue East, Unit O
Waterloo ON  N2K 4C9
Phone: (519) 569-8821
Fax: (519) 569-8823
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THERESA JOAN PITRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2002