Pitter, Barry Egbert (CPSO#: 74374)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 Oct 1999 to 01 May 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 02 May 2000 to 18 Oct 2000
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2000