Pittman, Tina Taschiauna (CPSO#: 93047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 113
Consult Kids Stratford
Jenny Trout Centre
342 Erie Street
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone: (519) 272-2040
Fax: 5192722323
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tina Pittman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pittman ( CPSO# 93047 )

Business Address:
Jenny Trout Centre
Consult Kids Stratford
342 Erie Street
Unit 113
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone Number: (519) 272-2040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TINA TASCHIAUNA PITTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015