Pizzuti, Giancarlo Fiorino (CPSO#: 95319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 128
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-0252
Fax: (519) 946-0253
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Giancarlo Pizzuti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Pizzuti ( CPSO# 95319 )

Business Address:
Suite 128
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 946-0252

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIANCARLO FIORINO PIZZUTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIZZUTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013