Plant, Mathew Aaron (CPSO#: 88388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
418 Eglinton Ave W
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5N 1A2
Phone: (416) 907-4704
Fax: (888) 591-9033
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinic 360
Unit 300
1131A Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M3C 3L8
Canada
Phone: (416) 907-4704
Fax: (888) 591-9033
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2 Champagne Dr.
Unit B17
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
Phone: 4162226160
Fax: 4166451978
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Plant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Plant ( CPSO# 88388 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
418 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A2

Business Address:
B17 - 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Business Address:
203 - 300 John Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone Number: (905) 764-0188

Business Address:
Magenta Health
Suite 108
625 Queen street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone Number: (416) 907-4704

Business Address:
Clinic 360
Unit 300
1131A Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M3C 3L8
Phone Number: (416) 907-4704

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATHEW AARON PLANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2014