Plant, Sandi Lynne (CPSO#: 77608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waypoint Centre for Mental
Healthcare
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 549-3181 Ext. 2866
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandi Plant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDI LYNNE PLANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2005