Platonov, Michael Alexander (CPSO#: 76917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 848-7900
Fax: (905) 615-8537
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Platonov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Platonov ( CPSO# 76917 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7557

Business Address:
206 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 848-7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALEXANDER PLATONOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLATONOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2001 to 03 Sep 2001
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009