Platt, Jennica Lynne (CPSO#: 90996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (647) 946-5439
Fax: (888) 610-5439
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 303
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 2T3
Brampton ON  L6R 2T3
Canada
Phone: (647) 946-5439
Fax: (888) 610-5439
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 101
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A7
Canada
Phone: 647-946-5439
Fax: 888-610-5439
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.L. Platt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kundhal ( CPSO# 81026 )
Dr. J. Platt ( CPSO# 90996 )

Business Address:
Unit 303
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (416) 587-0909

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (647) 946-5439

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNICA LYNNE PLATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLATT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016