Plenk, Katharina (CPSO#: 75298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Vienna, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2310
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Digestive Health Clinic
330 Highway 7 East
Suite 510
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-5007
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Plenk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Plenk ( CPSO# 75298 )

Business Address:
1366 Yonge Street
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0262

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2064

Business Address:
Digestive Health Clinic
330 Highway 7 East
Suite 510
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHARINA PLENK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLENK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004